HI HB1960 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds to support the planning and participation of the Hawaii aquaculture industry in the Aquaculture America 2020 conference. (HB1960 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Aquaculture.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16SenateThe committee on AEN deferred the measure.
2018-03-16SenateThe committee on ETT deferred the measure.
2018-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on ETT/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-18 1:25PM in conference room 414.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to ETT/AEN, WAM.
2018-03-08SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-03-08SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 293).
2018-03-06HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-03-02HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18.
2018-03-02HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1042-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole, Tupola.
2018-02-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-21-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2018-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
2018-02-14HouseReported from EDB/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 396-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2018-02-02HouseThe committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, DeCoite, Creagan, Gates, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2018-02-02HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2018-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB/OMH on Friday, 02-02-18 11:00AM in House conference room 309.
2018-01-22HouseReferred to EDB/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 5
2018-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2018-01-19HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback