HI HB196 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB196
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - Re-referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - Re-referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinstates the definition of "precinct" and amends the definition of "district" to facilitate the administration of elections.
Title
Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | House | Re-referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB196 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - Re-referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 4
SB419 (Same As) 2021-01-25 - Referred to JDC .
SB419 (Same As) 2021-01-25 - Referred to JDC .
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=196&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB196_.HTM |