HI HB1958 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Act 068, 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1169).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Hawaii Technology Development Corporation to issue grants to phase III federal grant awardees of up to 50 percent of the amount of the award or contract funded by the private sector or government sources outside of the Small Business Innovation Research Program. Appropriates moneys. (HB1958 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Hawaii Technology Development Corporation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-05SenateAct 068, 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1169).
2018-07-05HouseAct 068, on 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1169).
2018-05-03SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705).
2018-05-02HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2018-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849).
2018-05-01SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2018-05-01HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2018-04-27Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18.
2018-04-27SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 101-18).
2018-04-27HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18.
2018-04-27HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 101-18) as amended in (CD 1).
2018-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria.
2018-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-04-24HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-25-18 2:40PM in conference room 423.
2018-04-19HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801).
2018-04-19SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Galuteria, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs; L. Thielen.
2018-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
2018-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Evans, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Holt, Matsumoto.
2018-04-13SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608).
2018-04-12HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2018-04-10HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 626) in amended form (SD 1).
2018-04-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2018-04-06Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18.
2018-04-06SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3582) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2018-04-04SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211.
2018-03-20SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2018-03-20SenateReported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2978) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2018-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria.
2018-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-18 1:15PM in conference room 414.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to ETT, WAM.
2018-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 19).
2018-02-21HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-02-21HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 764-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-02-16HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Nakamura, Yamashita, Tupola.
2018-02-14HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-16-18 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
2018-02-05HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki, Todd excused (2).
2018-02-05HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 54-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2018-01-31HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
2018-01-29HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 01-31-18 9:30AM in conference room 309.
2018-01-26HouseThe committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Wednesday, 01-31-18 9:30AM.
2018-01-23HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 01-26-18 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
2018-01-22HouseReferred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5
2018-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2018-01-19HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback