HI HB195 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB195

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires government entities in the State that issue building permits to implement SolarAPP+ or a functionally equivalent online automated permitting platform that verifies code compliance and issues permits to licensed contractors for solar distributed energy resource systems in real time by 1/1/2024. Requires government entities in the State that issue building permits to adopt self-certification for solar distributed energy resource systems of 250 kilowatts or less that are not SolarAPP+ compatible. Makes the professional engineers, architects, surveyors, and landscape architects licensure law inapplicable to work with respect to residential distributed energy resource systems and increases the estimated cost of work on certain structures below which that licensure law is inapplicable. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Renewable Energy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2023-02-07HouseReported from EEP/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 110) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2023-02-02HouseThe committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2023-02-02HouseThe committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Perruso, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Woodson.
2023-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Thursday, 02-02-23 8:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-01-25HouseReferred to EEP/WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
2023-01-19HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2023-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB195 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
SB781 (Same As) 2023-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback