HI HB1949 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cachola voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes a naturopathic physician to prescribe testosterone consistent with naturopathic medical practice. Clarifies that narcotic drugs shall not be included within the naturopathic formulary. Authorizes the Board of Naturopathic Medicine to discipline a naturopathic physician for violation of the Uniform Controlled Substances Act. (HB1949 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Naturopathic Medicine.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-16HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 2 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cachola voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
2018-02-16HouseReported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 657-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to CPC/JUD.
2018-02-14HouseThe committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Fukumoto, Ito, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Cachola; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
2018-02-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Wednesday, 02-14-18 9:00AM in House conference room 429.
2018-02-01HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on IAC with Representative(s) McKelvey voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kong, C. Lee, McDermott, Say, Souki, Ward excused (6).
2018-02-01HouseReported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 26-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to IAC.
2018-01-25HouseThe committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Tupola.
2018-01-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Thursday, 01-25-18 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
2018-01-22HouseReferred to HHS, IAC, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 5
2018-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2018-01-19HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback