HI HB1945 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allocates TAT revenues into the tourism special fund and appropriates funds for the Hawaii tourism authority (HTA) and Hawaii Lodging and Tourism Association to address homelessness in tourist and resort areas, subject to private matching funds. Requires HTA and the Hawaii Lodging and Tourism Association to consult with the Hawaii Interagency Council on Homelessness prior to awarding funds for projects addressing homelessness. Requires HTA to report to the 2021 legislature. Effective 7/1/2099. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Transient Accommodations Tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Tourism & International Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Tourism & International Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Reported from EET/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3647) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Ihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) K. Rhoads ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-20 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to EET/HMS, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 151). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 910-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Nakamura, Nishimoto. |
2020-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-19-20 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from TIA/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 505-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on TIA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Holt, Cachola, DeCoite, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan. |
2020-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TIA/HSH on Wednesday, 02-12-20 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to TIA/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |