HI HB1943 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds for the establishment of two full-time equivalent (2.00 FTE) permanent program specialist positions within the office of language access to assist state agencies and state-funded agencies in implementing the requirements of Hawaii's language access law. Effective 7/1/3000. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Language Access.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
2018-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Learmont, Tupola.
2018-04-13SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608).
2018-04-12HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2018-04-10HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 625) in amended form (SD 1).
2018-04-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2018-04-06SenateOne Day Notice 04-10-18.
2018-04-06SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3668) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2018-04-04SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211.
2018-03-21SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2018-03-21SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3013) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2018-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang.
2018-03-09SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-18 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2018-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 17).
2018-02-21HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-02-21HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 786-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-02-16HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Tupola.
2018-02-14HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-16-18 4:00PM in House conference room 308.
2018-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
2018-02-13HouseReported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 342-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2018-02-09HouseThe committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Tupola.
2018-02-06HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Friday, 02-09-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2018-01-22HouseReferred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 5
2018-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2018-01-19HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2511 (Same As) 2018-04-03 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback