HI HB1936 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to LHE, AGR, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to LHE, AGR, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a P-20 agriculture education coordinator position within UH-CTAHR. Establishes a two-year farm to school grant pilot program within DOA to sunset on June 30, 2022. Appropriates funds for the farm to school grant pilot program and the P-20 agriculture education coordinator position.
Title
Relating To Agriculture Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to LHE, AGR, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1936&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1936_.HTM |