HI HB1936 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 119, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1220).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the environmental courts shall not have exclusive, original jurisdiction over any proceedings relating to parking violations under certain administrative rules and laws. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Environmental Courts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10HouseAct 119, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1220).
2018-07-10SenateAct 119, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1220).
2018-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2018-05-03SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 703).
2018-05-01HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Onishi, Takumi excused (2).
2018-05-01HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2018-05-01SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 695).
2018-04-27HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-12-18.
2018-04-25HouseThe House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Cullen, Quinlan, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 2:00PM in conference room 329.
2018-04-23HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-24-18 2:00PM in conference room 329.
2018-04-19HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801).
2018-04-19SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; L. Thielen.
2018-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
2018-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto, Cullen Co-Chairs; Quinlan, Thielen.
2018-04-13SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608).
2018-04-12HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2018-04-10HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 623) in amended form (SD 1).
2018-04-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2018-04-06SenateOne Day Notice 04-10-18.
2018-04-06SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3669) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2018-04-04SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211.
2018-03-21SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2018-03-21SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3035) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2018-03-16SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-18 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2018-03-09SenateRe-Referred to JDC, WAM.
2018-03-06SenateReferred to AEN, JDC.
2018-03-06SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-03-06SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 164).
2018-03-02HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-03-02HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 975-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-02-27HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, Tupola, Ward.
2018-02-23HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2018-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
2018-02-14HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 401-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2018-02-01HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Morikawa.
2018-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-01-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2018-01-22HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
2018-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2018-01-19HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2447 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback