HI HB1934 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 131, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1232).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 131, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1232).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the director of health from issuing permits for the construction of sewage wastewater injection wells unless alternative wastewater disposal options are not available, feasible, or practical. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Act 131, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1232). |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Act 131, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1232). |
2018-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 706). |
2018-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-03 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 701). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 700). |
2018-05-01 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-10-18. |
2018-05-01 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 785). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Riviere. |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Lowen Co-Chairs; Quinlan, McDermott. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 546). |
2018-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 563) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3415) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 03-28-18 9:15AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2949) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-18 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to AEN, CPH. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 163). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 954-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-18 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 717-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-15 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, McKelvey, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2018-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-15-18 8:35AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-02-09 | House | Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 21 |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to EEP/HHS, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |