HI HB192 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB192
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides to a taxpayer who hires an elderly individual a nonrefundable tax credit for the six-month period after the individual is initially hired by the taxpayer.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB174 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB192 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB192 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=192&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB192_.HTM |