HI HB1907 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on July 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Act 207, 07/05/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on July 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Act 207, 07/05/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all law enforcement agencies and departments charged with maintenance, storage, and preservation of sexual assault evidence collection kits to conduct an inventory of all stored kits and report to the Attorney General. Requires the Department of the Attorney General to report to the Legislature on the number of untested sexual assault evidence collection kits being stored, plans and procedures for the disposition of new and untested kits, and related information. Appropriates funds for testing of at least 500 kits by December 31, 2016. (HB1907 CD1)
Title
Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit; Reporting; Attorney General; Sexual Assault; Forensic Evidence; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-06 | Senate | Act 207, 07/05/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309). |
2016-07-07 | House | Act 207, on 07/05/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 98-16). |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 98-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Rhoads, Ichiyama, Yamashita, Belatti, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Keith-Agaran, Tokuda, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-16 9:15AM in conference room 229. |
2016-04-22 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 04-26-16 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2016-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-16 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2016-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-22-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 618). |
2016-04-19 | House | House conferee(s) added: Representative(s) Ichiyama as Co-Chairs. |
2016-04-19 | House | Re-referred to HUS, JUD, PBS, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Morikawa, Rhoads, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Belatti, San Buenaventura, Ward. |
2016-04-18 | House | Re-referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 51 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Keith-Agaran, Tokuda Co-Chairs; Baker, Slom. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 546) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3560) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) K.Kahele, Kim, L. Thielen. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-16 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3040) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, JDL/WAM. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-16 1:45PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 233). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 988-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-03 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-03-02 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-03-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 326-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-02-11 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2016-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-11-16 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2309 (Same As) 2016-03-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4).