HI HB1906 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 147, on 07/06/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1248).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 147, on 07/06/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1248).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes intentionally or knowingly causing bodily injury to certain health care workers a Class C felony. (HB1906 CD1)
Title
Relating To Health Care Workers.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Act 147, on 07/06/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1248). |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Act 147, 07/06/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1248). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) K. Rhoads. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 67-18). |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 67-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Keohokalole, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 10:45AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-18 10:45AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-18 10:45AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-18 10:45AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 804). |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; Gabbard, Ihara. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Mizuno, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Keohokalole, Matsumoto. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 620) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 3 (Senator(s) English, Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3554) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) K. Rhoads ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3095) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 288). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1121-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-01-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from LAB/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 606-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2018-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB/HHS on Tuesday, 02-13-18 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to LAB/HHS, JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2491 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Referred to LAB/HHS, JUD, referral sheet 35
Subjects
Felony Assault in the Second Degree
Health Care Worker
Intentionally or Knowingly Causing Bodily Injury
Health Care Worker
Intentionally or Knowingly Causing Bodily Injury