HI HB1901 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-26 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-26 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes any count department of the prosecuting attorney in the definition of "law enforcement officer". Requires the law enforcement standards board to review and recommend policies regarding the use of force and receive and investigate complaints of a law enforcement officer's actions or omissions that may result in denial, suspension, or revocation of the officer's certification. Requires the board to adopt rules that establish criteria for denial, suspension, or revocation of a law enforcement officer's certification upon a finding that the officer violated written departmental policy or used unjustified force. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Public Safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-26 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3694) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Harimoto. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 06-25-20 1:45PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 03-17-20 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-20 1:45PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 145). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 920-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Nakashima, Yamane. |
2020-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-20 at 2:30pm. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-24-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 525-20), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi. |
2020-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 02-12-20 10:00AM in House conference room 430. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to PVM, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |