HI HB1899 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes penalties for the misbranding of fish or fish products that results in consumer illness. Creates the Fish Misbranding Special Fund. Authorizes the Director of Health to prohibit the sale of fish or fish products deemed to be a credible health concern.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Lei Learmont [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Tuesday, 02-06-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-31 | House | Re-referred to HHS, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 13 |
2018-01-26 | House | Re-referred to OMH/HHS, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to OMH/HHS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1899&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1899_.HTM |