HI HB1898 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
When identifying a replacement vehicle or cash settlement value, requires an insurer to take into consideration costs of shipping the vehicle and the insured's travel for pre-purchase inspection of the replacement vehicle, if not on the same island, and, if the insured vehicle is an electric vehicle, the remaining battery life and capacity of the vehicle's primary battery, known as the traction battery pack, which shall have equal or greater weight than mileage on the vehicle.
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicle Valuation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2541 (Same As) 2022-02-16 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1898&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1898_.HTM |