HI HB1898 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Agriculture to adopt rules to protect the welfare of livestock transported to, from, or between any island of Hawaii. Requires the department to adopt interim rules.
Title
Relating To Livestock Transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 01-29-20 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to AGR, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2715 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1898&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1898_.HTM |