HI HB1891 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 107, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1207).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 107, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1207).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the Uniform Recognition and Enforcement of Canadian Domestic-Violence Protection Orders Act. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Uniform Recognition And Enforcement Of Canadian Domestic-violence Protection Orders Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Act 107, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1207). |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Act 107, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1207). |
2022-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 822). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2022-04-29 | House | Deferred one day 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 814). |
2022-04-28 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-22. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 807). |
2022-04-28 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2022-04-25 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 906). |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 768). |
2022-04-22 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Tam, Ward. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 576). |
2022-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 731) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Acasio, Ihara, Inouye). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3757) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-31-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3290) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 48). |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 678-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2022-02-16 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 427-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-10 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-10-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2393 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 24
Subjects
Uniform Recognition and Enforcement of Canadian Domestic-Violence Protection Orders Act
Women's Legislative Caucus
Women's Legislative Caucus