HI HB1888 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to DOA for the pesticide subsidy program.
Title
Relating To The Pesticide Subsidy Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-20 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2020-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-20. |
2020-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-07-20 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2020-02-03 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-05-20 8:35AM in conference room 312. |
2020-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-05-20 8:35AM in House conference room 312. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2957 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1888&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1888_.HTM |