HI HB1885 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-3)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-02 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Ward excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain persons to immediately report a potential tort claim to the family court when that person has reason to believe that a child in foster custody has suffered an injury that may arise to a tort claim. Establishes procedures for the family court to allow a child in foster custody who has suffered an injury to seek outside legal representation for a claim of damages as a result of a tort. (HB1885 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Family Court.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-02HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Ward excused (2).
2018-02-02HouseReported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 29-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2018-01-31HouseThe committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
2018-01-25HouseBill scheduled for decision-making on Wednesday, 01-31-18 10:00AM in House conference room 329.
2018-01-25HouseThe committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Wednesday, 01-31-18 10:00AM in House conference room 329.
2018-01-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Thursday, 01-25-18 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
2018-01-22HouseReferred to HHS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4
2018-01-19HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2018-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2273 (Same As) 2018-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback