HI HB1877 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-21 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-21 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Raises the threshold under the contractor licensing law's handyman exemption from $1,000 to an unspecified amount. (HB1877 HD1)
Title
Relating To Contractors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-21-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 612-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Evans. |
2018-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-13-18 9:15AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to LAB, CPC, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2376 (Same As) 2018-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH.