HI HB1874 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Lowers the age at which enhanced penalties apply for crimes against seniors from sixty-two years of age to an unspecified age. Makes commission of certain criminal offenses against a senior's person or property applicable regardless of the perpetrator's knowledge of the senior victim's age. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Criminal Offenses Against Seniors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25SenateThe committee on JDC deferred the measure.
2020-06-23SenateThe committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 06-25-20 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2020-06-19SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 06-23-20 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 10:05AM in conference room 016.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to JDC.
2020-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 301).
2020-03-03HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-27HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1).
2020-02-27HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 792-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2020-02-25HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Brower, Lowen, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, McKelvey, Perruso; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Nakashima, Yamane.
2020-02-24HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:30PM in conference room 325.
2020-02-24HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-20 at 2:30pm.
2020-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-24-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2020-01-23HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 3
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2334 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback