HI HB1864 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Re-Referred to EET, CPH/WAM.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the definition of renewable portfolio standard to be a percentage of electrical energy generation, rather than sales. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Renewable Energy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09SenateRe-Referred to EET, CPH/WAM.
2020-03-03SenateReferred to EET, CPH.
2020-02-28SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-02-28SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 35).
2020-02-27HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-27HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 723-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott.
2020-02-19HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-20 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-14HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
2020-02-14HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 516-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2020-02-11HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cabanilla Arakawa, Har, Kong, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Mizuno, Matsumoto.
2020-02-10HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-11-20 2:00PM in conference room 329.
2020-02-05HouseThe committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-20.
2020-02-03HouseBill re-scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-05-20 2:00PM in conference room 329.
2020-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-05-20 2:00PM in House conference room 320.
2020-01-31HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Matsumoto, Say excused (3).
2020-01-31HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 7-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2020-01-28HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger.
2020-01-24HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-28-20 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2020-01-23HouseReferred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
2020-01-17HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-16HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2317 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Referred to EET, CPH.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback