HI HB1864 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the criteria for granting a variance. Takes effect on 1/1/2100. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Renewable Energy Technologies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 225. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 2:00PM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-26 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-24 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 834). |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conferees Added: Senator Dela Cruz added as Co-Chair. |
2018-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Espero, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Evans, Lowen Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 613) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3556) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-18 1:30PM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-16-18 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-18 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 14). |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 796-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-16 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakamura. |
2018-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-16-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-13 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 324-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-07-18 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-29 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Mizuno excused (2). |
2018-01-29 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDB. |
2018-01-25 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Cullen, Kong, McKelvey, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, McDermott. |
2018-01-25 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-01-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-25-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to EEP, EDB, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |