HI HB1863 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii State Energy Office to conduct a study to provide recommendations for a comprehensive approach to the development of electric vehicle infrastructure. Appropriates moneys. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2). |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 245-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to TRN. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-30-20 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to EEP, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2020-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3028 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.