HI HB1861 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the sunset date for the Coffee Berry Borer Pesticide Subsidy Program until June 30, 2025, for the purchase of pesticides containing Beauveria bassiana to combat the coffee berry borer. Extends the program manager position to June 30, 2026. Appropriates funds. Takes effect on 7/1/2150. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Coffee Berry Borer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2020-03-05SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-20 1:15PM in conference room 224.
2020-03-03SenateReferred to AEN, WAM.
2020-02-28SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-02-28SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 34).
2020-02-27HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Kong excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-27HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 689-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-20HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-02-18HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-20 12:00PM in House conference room 308.
2020-01-31HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Matsumoto, Say excused (3).
2020-01-31HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 5-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-01-29HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Holt, Onishi, Perruso, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-01-24HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 01-29-20 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2020-01-23HouseReferred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3
2020-01-17HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-16HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2623 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 36

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback