HI HB1860 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Referred to CPN, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Referred to CPN, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires licensed used motor vehicle parts dealers to keep certain records of catalytic converter purchases and shipments. Establishes the felony offense of theft of catalytic converter. Increases the penalty for engaging in certain business related to used motor vehicle parts and accessories without a license. Requires scrap dealers to keep records of purchases of palladium, platinum, and rhodium. Requires all scrap dealers or recyclers to pay for palladium, platinum, and rhodium, and used motor vehicle parts dealers to pay for catalytic converters, by check. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Catalytic Converters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 281). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 937-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 238-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-02 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Onishi. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-02-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2522 (Same As) 2022-01-24 - Referred to CPN, JDC.