HI HB1859 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]


Allows a minor to petition the Family Court for emancipation, and directs the court regarding investigation of the petition, appointment of legal counsel and a guardian ad litem for the petitioner, and the findings necessary to grant the petition. Specifies the rights gained by the minor upon emancipation and authorizes the court to require the minor's parents or legal guardians to pay for any services ordered by the court. Requires emancipation proceedings to be stayed until final disposition of the minor's child protective case under chapter 587A, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Effective 7/1/3000. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating To Children.



2018-03-21SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2018-03-21SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2993) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2018-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda.
2018-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-18 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to HMS, JDC.
2018-03-08SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-03-08SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 282).
2018-03-06HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Tupola voting no (3) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-03-02HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18.
2018-03-02HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1082-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-03-01HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2018-02-27HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-01-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2018-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
2018-02-13HouseReported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 306-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2018-01-30HouseThe committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
2018-01-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Tuesday, 01-30-18 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
2018-01-22HouseReferred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 4
2018-01-19HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2018-01-18HousePending introduction.


Hawaii State Sources

Bill Comments