HI HB1853 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Cachola, Takai excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Cachola, Takai excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Waives duty to diversify trust when trust provision directs retention of property. Requires dissenting trustee to dissent in writing to a failure to act or enter into a transaction. Allows settlor of a trust to designate investment function to an advisor, and administrative function to an administrative trustee. Effective July 1, 2014. (HB1853 HD1)
Title
Trusts; Diversification; Trust Administration; Trustees; Standards and Performance; Advisors
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Cachola, Takai excused (3). |
2014-02-10 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 266-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Har, Yamane. |
2014-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-14. |
2014-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-03-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2364 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Referred to JDL, WAM.