HI HB1846 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-08-31 - Notice of Intent to veto dated 08-31-20 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires and establishes deadlines for all state facilities with an area of 10,000 square feet and over, except facilities at Aloha Stadium, to implement all cost-effective energy efficiency measures. Provides that certain agencies that perform energy efficiency retrofitting may continue to receive appropriations for energy expenditures at an amount that accounts for any costs or debt service for the implementation and management of energy efficiency measures. Beginning 7/1/2020, requires, where feasible and cost-effective, the design of all new state building construction to maximize energy and water efficiency, maximize energy generation potential, and use building materials that reduce the carbon footprint of the project. Directs the Hawaii State Energy Office to collect utility bill and energy usage data for state-owned buildings and to make the data publicly available. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Energy Efficiency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-31SenateNotice of Intent to veto dated 08-31-20 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119)
2020-08-31HouseNotice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1119)
2020-07-10HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2020-07-10SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration; agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 424).
2020-07-10HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, Ohno excused (2).
2020-07-10HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2020-07-10HouseReconsideration of action taken on 07-08-20.
2020-07-08SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417).
2020-07-08HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2020-07-06HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 577) in amended form (SD 2).
2020-07-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-07-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 07-06-20.
2020-07-02SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3781) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2020-07-02SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
2020-07-02SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 07-02-20 12:31PM in conference room Auditorium.
2020-06-24SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2020-06-24SenateReported from EET/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3662) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2020-06-22SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, J.Keohokalole.
2020-06-19SenateThe committee(s) on EET will hold a public decision making on 06-22-20 3:05PM in conference room 224.
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-10SenateThe committee(s) on EET deferred the measure until 03-16-20 2:45PM in conference room 414.
2020-03-10SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Fevella.
2020-03-06SenateThe committee(s) on EET/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-20 3:00PM in conference room 225.
2020-03-03SenateReferred to EET/GVO, WAM.
2020-02-28SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-02-28SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 28).
2020-02-27HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Kong excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-27HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 717-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott.
2020-02-19HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-20 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-14HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
2020-02-14HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 573-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2020-02-13HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-02-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-13-20 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
2020-02-07HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
2020-02-07HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 244-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB.
2020-02-04HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-01-30HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-04-20 11:25AM in conference room 325.
2020-01-30HouseThe committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-20 at 11:25AM.
2020-01-27HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-30-20 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2020-01-21HouseReferred to EEP, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2
2020-01-17HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-16HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback