HI HB1841 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires benchmarking for all nonresidential buildings. Resulting benchmarking data will be disclosed to a prospective buyer, lessee, or lender. (HB1841 HD2)
Title
Relating To Energy.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6). |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 447-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, McKelvey, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-13-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-02-08 | House | Re-referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 19 |
2018-02-08 | House | Recommitted to EEP with none voting no and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused. |
2018-02-08 | House | Recommends recommittal to EEP. |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 190-18) as amended in HD 1. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, McKelvey, Todd, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2018-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-06-18 11:35AM in conference room 325. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to EEP, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |