HI HB1840 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - The committee(s) on WTL/GVO deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-22-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - The committee(s) on WTL/GVO deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-22-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the appropriate county land use decision-making authority to determine district boundary amendments involving land areas over fifteen acres but less than or equal to fifty acres, subject to land use commission review and approval. Prohibits parceling of such lands. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To District Boundary Amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/GVO deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-22-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to WTL/GVO, JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 276). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Lowen, Marten, McKelvey, Perruso, Quinlan, Wildberger voting no (9) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1024-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, Nishimoto, Sayama, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Tam; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Marten, Perruso, Wildberger; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-03-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-03-22 2:30PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-01 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-03-22. |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-17 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kitagawa, LoPresti, Lowen, Marten, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Okimoto, Perruso, Quinlan, Wildberger voting no (6) and none excused (0). |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 544-22), recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-02-11 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa. |
2022-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-11-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Lowen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, McKelvey, Quinlan, Wildberger voting no (4) and Representative(s) LoPresti, Perruso excused (2). |
2022-02-04 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 5-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-02-01 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden, B. Kobayashi; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, McDermott. |
2022-01-28 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-01-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2920 (Same As) 2022-01-31 - Re-Referred to WTL/GVO, JDC/WAM.