HI HB1829 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cachola, Matsumoto, Pouha, Say voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tupola, Ward voting no (6) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends penalties pertaining to certain medical marijuana prohibitions. Repeals certain medical marijuana prohibitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Marijuana; Prohibitions; Penalties

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-19HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cachola, Matsumoto, Pouha, Say voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tupola, Ward voting no (6) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4).
2016-02-19HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 611-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2016-02-18HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Nakashima.
2016-02-12HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-18-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2016-02-12HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-18-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2016-02-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-12-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2016-02-03HouseRe-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 8
2016-01-27HouseReferred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
2016-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2016-01-22HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback