HI HB1823 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes licensing and regulatory requirements for practice of respiratory care. Establishes board of respiratory care in the department of commerce and consumer affairs, provides for disciplinary criteria, and penalties.
Title
Establish Board of Respiratory Care; Regulation of Respiratory Care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-03 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-03-09 8:30am in House conference room 329. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1823&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB1823_.HTM |