HI HB1821 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits declaratory judgments when there is a cause of action and in other certain instances. Requires a plaintiff to show a personal stake in the actual controversy beyond a general disagreement or complaint by requiring a showing of an injury-in-fact.
Title
Relating To Declaratory Judgments.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-20 at 2:30pm. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-24-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2020-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2810 (Same As) 2020-02-20 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1821&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1821_.HTM |