HI HB1820 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Re-referred to ECD, CPC/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Re-referred to ECD, CPC/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants a 10-year license for 1 stand-alone, members-only casino in Waikiki, not in a hotel. Allows guests 21 years of age or older who register to stay 1 day and night at a hotel on Oahu for each day of admission at $20-per-day pass. Establishes the Hawaii gaming control commission. Imposes wagering tax on gross receipts. Creates the state gaming fund and compulsive gambler program.
Title
Relating To Casino Gaming.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Re-referred to ECD, CPC/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to ECD, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1820&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1820_.HTM |