HI HB1813 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a three-year pilot program to create a new category of professional licensure for assistant physicians, through which recent medical school graduates who have passed certain medical exams but have not been placed into a residency program may work under the supervision of a licensed physician to provide primary care in medically underserved areas. (HB1813 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Health.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-16HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 2 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
2018-02-16HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 553-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2018-02-14HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Yamane.
2018-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-14-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2018-02-09HouseRe-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 21
2018-02-08HouseRe-referred to HHS/IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 19
2018-02-08HouseRecommitted to HHS with none voting no and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused.
2018-02-08HouseRecommends recommittal to HHS.
2018-02-08HouseReported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 191-18) as amended in HD 1.
2018-02-06HouseThe committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2018-02-01HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-06-18 8:30AM in conference room 329.
2018-01-22HouseReferred to HHS, referral sheet 4
2018-01-17HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading
2018-01-16HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback