HI HB1806 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 087, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1187).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 087, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1187).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires cesspools in the State to be upgraded or converted to a wastewater system approved by the Director of Health before 1/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Cesspool Conversion.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Greggor Ilagan [D] | Rep. Lisa Kitagawa [D] |
Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Act 087, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1187). |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Act 087, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1187). |
2022-04-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-04-25 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 906). |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Gabbard, Wakai Co-Chairs; Moriwaki, Fevella. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 741). |
2022-04-21 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, McKelvey excused (2). |
2022-04-21 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 735). |
2022-04-20 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-22. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 576). |
2022-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 730) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Acasio, Ihara, Inouye). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-08-22. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3839) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Misalucha, Wakai. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-22 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HTH/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3465) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, San Buenaventura. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HTH/AEN, WAM. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 267). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1000-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Holt, Todd. |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti, Perruso excused (2). |
2022-02-04 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 20-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-01 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-01-28 | House | Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-01-22 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |