HI HB1806 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOH to educate food establishments about liability protections. Expands liability protection for donors to include donations of food and similar donations made directly to needy persons. Authorizes the donation of expired food when the donor believes in good faith that the food remains fit for human consumption. (HB1806 HD1)
Title
Relating To Food Donation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3074) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-18 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 151). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1000-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-15 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2018-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-15-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-31 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Ward excused (2). |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 9-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-01-25 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Tupola. |
2018-01-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Thursday, 01-25-18 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |