HI HB1805 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires adoption of a concurrent resolution by two-thirds majority vote of each house of the Legislature in order to sell or exchange ceded lands. (HB1805 HD1)
Title
Ceded Lands; Public Lands; Sale
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLO/JUD with none voting no (0) and Takai, Takumi, Wakai excused (3). | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 76) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WLO/JUD. | |
2009-02-04 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Shimabukuro, Belatti, Bertram, Brower, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 02-04-09 9:00 AM in House conference room 329. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to HAW, WLO/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |