HI HB1804 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Gates, Har, LoPresti, Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Gates, Har, LoPresti, Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts affordable housing projects developed or financed by HHFDC or a county, housing projects that satisfy county affordable housing requirements and qualify for county fee exemptions, and affordable rental housing for which the developer received Low-Income Housing Tax Credits from school impact fees. (HB1804 HD1)
Title
Relating To School Impact Fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Gates, Har, LoPresti, Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6). |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 488-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-08 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 02-08-18 9:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |