HI HB1801 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the public utilities commission to study the technical feasibility of establishing renewable portfolio standards for gas utility companies in Hawaii. Requires reports to the legislature. Appropriates funds. Takes effect on 1/28/2045. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Renewable Energy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2018-03-23SenateReported from TRE/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3130) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2018-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto.
2018-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman.
2018-03-16SenateThe committee(s) on TRE/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-18 1:30PM in conference room 225.
2018-03-06SenateReferred to TRE/CPH, WAM.
2018-03-06SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-03-06SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 150).
2018-03-02HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-03-02HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 953-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-02-23HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Nakamura, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Lowen, Todd, Tupola.
2018-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2018-02-16HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
2018-02-16HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 547-18), recommending referral to FIN.
2018-02-13HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, LoPresti, Mizuno, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ito, Say, Tokioka; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson.
2018-02-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-13-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2018-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2).
2018-02-08HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 151-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2018-02-06HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, McKelvey, Todd, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
2018-01-31HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-06-18 11:30AM in conference room 325.
2018-01-25HouseThe committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-18.
2018-01-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-25-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2018-01-22HouseReferred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4
2018-01-17HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading
2018-01-16HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback