HI HB1798 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the AG to convene a working group to examine laws relating to corporal punishment as a form of discipline in the State, and submit a report to the legislature prior to the 2021 regular session. Takes effect on 12/31/2059. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Safe And Effective Discipline.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-31 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-26-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-20 at 2:00pm. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) McDermott voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2). |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 383-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-01-31 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2020-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 01-31-20 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2020-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2570 (Same As) 2020-01-29 - Re-Referred to HMS, JDC.