HI HB1792 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to TRN, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to TRN, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a new chapter to regulate the use of unmanned aerial vehicles. Requires the director of the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs to adopt rules as necessary. Establishes prohibited uses of unmanned aerial vehicles and penalties, and authorizes civil action for violations. Makes certain uses of an unmanned aerial vehicle a misdemeanor. Clarifies that under certain circumstances, the used of an unmanned aerial vehicle may constitute an invasion of privacy.
Title
Relating To Unmanned Aerial Vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2160 (Same As) 2018-02-07 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1792&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1792_.HTM |