HI HB1786 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - The committee(s) on LAT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - The committee(s) on LAT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Renames the workforce development council the workforce development board. Requires the state workforce development board and local workforce development boards to develop conflict of interest policies. Amends the composition and powers of the board. Effective 7/1/2023.
Title
Relating To Workforce Development Boards.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Jackson Sayama [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
Rep. David Tarnas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on LAT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 02-08-22 9:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1786&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1786_.HTM |