HI HB1784 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

For taxable years beginning after 12/31/2024, temporarily reinstates the Technology Infrastructure Renovation Tax Credit and expands the definition of "technology-enabled infrastructure" to include data servers. Sunsets the tax credit for taxable years beginning after 12/31/2027. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-20SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2024-03-20SenateReported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3129) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2024-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Ihara, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2024-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-24 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
2024-03-07SenateReferred to LBT, WAM.
2024-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2024-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 95).
2024-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2024-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 777-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2024-02-23HouseThe committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Kila, Ward.
2024-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-24 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2024-02-16HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
2024-02-16HouseReported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 534-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2024-02-14HouseThe committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, La Chica, Marten, Martinez, M. Mizuno, Woodson, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Quinlan, Todd.
2024-02-12HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-14-24 2:00PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2024-02-09HouseThe committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-24.
2024-02-07HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HET on Friday, 02-09-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2024-01-24HouseReferred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 1
2024-01-19HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2024-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2527 (Same As) 2024-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Kitagawa, Lamosao, Lowen, Nakashima excused (5).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback