HI HB1777 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 325, 7/10/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1442).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Adds a new chapter to the Hawaii Revised Statutes allowing judges to order the production of records by persons or entities located outside of the State, in all criminal cases. Requires a Hawaii resident served with criminal process from another state to comply with the criminal process. Amends the definition of summons under section 836-1, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to include subpeonas ad testificandum and duces tecum. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Production of Records; Prosecuting Attorney Package

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-10 (S) Act 325, 7/10/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1442).
2012-07-10 (H) Act 325, on 7/10/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1442).
2012-04-26 (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 681).
2012-04-25 (H) Transmitted to Governor.
2012-04-25 (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1).
2012-04-25 (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2012-04-25 (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 675).
2012-04-24 (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-12
2012-04-20 (H) The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Tsuji, Fontaine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2012-04-19 (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-20-12 2:30PM in conference room 325.
2012-04-17 (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 758).
2012-04-17 (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Ihara, Slom.
2012-04-17 (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 612).
2012-04-16 (H) House conferees appointed: Keith-Agaran, M. Lee Co-Chairs; Tsuji, Fontaine.
2012-04-13 (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 547).
2012-04-12 (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2012-04-10 (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 543) in amended form (SD 1).
2012-04-10 (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2012-04-05 (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-12.
2012-04-05 (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2012-04-05 (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3196) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2012-04-02 (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2012-03-29 (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-12 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2012-03-08 (S) Referred to JDL.
2012-03-08 (S) Passed First Reading.
2012-03-08 (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 83).
2012-03-06 (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2012-03-02 (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 769-12), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2012-02-23 (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2012-02-21 (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2012-02-21 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-12 6:00PM in House conference room 308.
2012-02-17 (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, M. Lee, Mizuno, Morikawa excused (5).
2012-02-17 (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 634-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2012-02-07 (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Carroll, Herkes, Ito, Luke, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Cabanilla, Coffman, McKelvey.
2012-02-03 (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-07-12 2:30PM in conference room 325.
2012-02-03 (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-12 at 2:30pm.
2012-02-01 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-03-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2012-01-19 (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
2012-01-18 (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading.
2012-01-13 (H) Prefiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2064 (Same As) 2012-01-19 - (S) Referred to JDL.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback