HI HB1772 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-16 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 738).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-16 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 738).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to support the Department of Health's Senior Fall Prevention Campaign. Declares that the appropriation exceeds the state general fund expenditure ceiling for 20242025. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Fall Prevention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 738). |
2024-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Marten, Chun Co-Chairs; Amato, Kobayashi, Garcia. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 515) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3762) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:15AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3205) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-18-24 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HHS, WAM. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 89). |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 792-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-26 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-26-24 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, Nakashima, Ward excused (3). |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 75-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-01 | House | The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Marten, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-01-24 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2471 (Same As) 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation
DOH
General Fund Expenditure Ceiling Exceeded ($)
Kupuna Caucus
Senior Fall Prevention Campaign
DOH
General Fund Expenditure Ceiling Exceeded ($)
Kupuna Caucus
Senior Fall Prevention Campaign