HI HB1768 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of labor and industrial relations to establish and administer a family leave insurance program. Provides family leave insurance benefits and extends the period of family leave to 16 weeks for businesses that employ one or more employees who meet the hourly qualifications. Eliminates the previous threshold of 100 employees for employers to be subject to the family leave law. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Family Leave.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2474 (Same As) 2024-03-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Alcos, Martinez, Quinlan excused (3).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1768&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1768_.HTM |