HI HB1756 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the process for adoption of the state fire code to conform with other Hawaii state building codes. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The State Fire Code.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 03-17-20 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-20 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 132). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 921-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-26 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Nakashima, Perruso, Say, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey, Yamane. |
2020-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-26-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-20 at 2:00pm. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2). |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 74-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno, Matsumoto. |
2020-01-27 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 01-30-20 2:30PM in conference room 329. |
2020-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 01-30-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-15 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2130 (Same As) 2020-07-13 - Enrolled to Governor.